Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB809 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 31, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2021
Analysis May 12, 2021
Analysis March 26, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2021
Bill March 29, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2021
Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 28, 2021
Fiscal Note March 16, 2021