Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB809 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.B. No. 809


 AN ACT
 relating to health care institution reporting of federal money
 received for the coronavirus disease public health emergency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 81A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 81A. CORONAVIRUS DISEASE PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY REPORTING
 Sec. 81A.001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Coronavirus disease public health emergency"
 means the period:
 (A)  beginning on the date the public health
 emergency declared by the United States secretary of health and
 human services under Section 319, Public Health Service Act (42
 U.S.C. Section 247d), on January 31, 2020, with respect to the
 coronavirus disease (COVID-19) took effect; and
 (B)  ending on the earlier of:
 (i)  the date the public health emergency
 described by Paragraph (A) of this subdivision ends; or
 (ii)  January 1, 2023.
 (2)  "Health care institution" has the meaning assigned
 by Section 74.001, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 Sec. 81A.002.  HEALTH CARE INSTITUTION REPORT. (a)  Except
 as provided by Subsection (b), and subject to Subsection (d), a
 health care institution that receives federal money for assisting
 health care institutions during the coronavirus disease public
 health emergency, including money received under the Coronavirus
 Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act (15 U.S.C. Section 9001 et
 seq.), the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021 (Pub. L.
 No. 116-260), and the American Rescue Plan Act of 2021 (Pub. L.
 No. 117-2), shall report the money received to the commission on a
 monthly basis.  A health care institution's initial report to the
 commission must include all federal money received by the
 institution during the period beginning January 31, 2020, and
 ending August 31, 2021.
 (b)  A health care institution is not required to report
 federal money:
 (1)  received as a loan during the coronavirus disease
 public health emergency from the United States Small Business
 Administration as part of a paycheck protection program; or
 (2)  received under Subsection (a) if the health care
 institution returned or repaid the money to the federal government.
 (c)  Each quarter, the commission shall compile the
 information described by Subsection (a) into a written report
 provided to:
 (1)  the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of
 the house of representatives;
 (2)  the Legislative Budget Board; and
 (3)  the standing committees of the legislature with
 primary jurisdiction over state finance and public health.
 (d)  The commission shall establish procedures for health
 care institutions to report the information required under
 Subsection (a). In establishing the procedures, the commission
 shall to the extent practicable:
 (1)  minimize duplication of reporting by institutions
 to the commission; and
 (2)  avoid requiring institutions to report
 information that is duplicative of information that institutions
 are required to report to the federal government.
 Sec. 81A.003.  DISCIPLINARY ACTION BY LICENSING AUTHORITY.
 The appropriate licensing authority may take disciplinary action
 against a health care institution that violates this chapter as if
 the institution violated an applicable licensing law.
 Sec. 81A.004.  EXPIRATION. This chapter expires September
 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 809 passed the Senate on
 March 31, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 809 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 18, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 136,
 Nays 1, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor