Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB818 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 28, 2021
Analysis May 13, 2021
Analysis March 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 13, 2021
Bill April 12, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 24, 2021