Senate | 04/27/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/27/2021 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/26/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred to Local Government | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |