Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB832 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2021

Analysis

Analysis April 27, 2021
Analysis April 16, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 25, 2021
Fiscal Note April 17, 2021