Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB832 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 04/27/2021

                            By: Blanco S.B. No. 832
 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2021; March 11, 2021,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
 April 27, 2021, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 27, 2021,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 832 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the operations and administration of the El Paso County
 Hospital District.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 281, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 281.060 to read as follows:
 Sec. 281.060.  EL PASO COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT; BROKER
 AGREEMENTS AND FEES FOR SALE OF REAL PROPERTY. (a) In this
 section:
 (1)  "Broker" means a person licensed as a broker under
 Chapter 1101, Occupations Code.
 (2)  "District" means the El Paso County Hospital
 District.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), the El Paso County
 Hospital District may contract with a broker to sell a tract of real
 property that is owned by the district.
 (c)  The district may not contract with a broker who is
 related within the third degree of consanguinity, as determined
 under Chapter 573, Government Code, to:
 (1)  a member of the board of hospital managers of the
 district; or
 (2)  a public official who serves on the El Paso County
 Commissioners Court.
 (d)  The district may pay a fee if a broker produces a ready,
 willing, and able buyer to purchase a tract of real property.
 (e)  If a contract made under Subsection (b) requires a
 broker to list the tract of real property for sale for at least 30
 days with a multiple-listing service used by other brokers in the
 county in which the real property is located, the district, on or
 after the 30th day after the date the property is listed, may sell
 the tract of real property to a ready, willing, and able buyer who
 is produced by any broker, including a broker described by
 Subsection (c), using the multiple-listing service and who submits
 the most advantageous offer.
 (f)  The district must post a notice of intent to sell the
 real property in a newspaper of general circulation, not less than
 once, at least 14 days before the date the district accepts an offer
 produced by a broker.
 (g)  The district may sell a tract of real property under
 this section without complying with the requirements of Section
 272.001, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 281.0221, Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 * * * * *