Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB863 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 3, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2021
Analysis April 26, 2021
Analysis March 15, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2021
Bill March 22, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 16, 2021