Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB911 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 9, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 2, 2021
Analysis May 5, 2021
Analysis March 24, 2021
Analysis March 13, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 5, 2021
Bill March 26, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 25, 2021
Fiscal Note March 14, 2021