Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB911 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/19/2021

                            S.B. No. 911


 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of restaurants and third-party food
 delivery services, including the issuance of certain alcoholic
 beverage certificates to restaurants.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.04, Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended by adding Subdivision (29) to read as follows:
 (29)  "Restaurant" means a business that:
 (A)  operates its own permanent food service
 facility with commercial cooking equipment on its premises; and
 (B)  prepares and offers to sell multiple entrees
 for consumption on or off the premises.
 SECTION 2.  Section 25.13(a-1), Alcoholic Beverage Code, as
 effective September 1, 2021, is amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A holder of a wine and malt beverage retailer's permit
 may be issued a food and beverage certificate by the commission if:
 (1)  the permit holder is a restaurant; or
 (2)  the commission finds that the receipts from the
 sale of alcoholic beverages by the permit holder at the location are
 60 percent or less of the total receipts from the location.
 SECTION 3.  Section 28.18(a-1), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A holder of a mixed beverage permit may be issued a
 food and beverage certificate by the commission if:
 (1)  the permit holder is a restaurant; or
 (2)  the commission finds that the receipts from the
 sale of alcoholic beverages by the permit holder at the location are
 60 percent or less of the total receipts from the location.
 SECTION 4.  Section 32.23(a-1), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A holder of a private club registration permit may be
 issued a food and beverage certificate by the commission if:
 (1)  the permit holder is a restaurant; or
 (2)  the commission finds that the receipts from the
 service of alcoholic beverages by the permit holder at the location
 are 60 percent or less of the total receipts from the location.
 SECTION 5.  Section 69.16(a-1), Alcoholic Beverage Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A holder of a retail dealer's on-premise license may
 be issued a food and beverage certificate by the commission if:
 (1)  the license holder is a restaurant; or
 (2)  the commission finds that the receipts from the
 sale of alcoholic beverages by the license holder at the location
 are 60 percent or less of the total receipts from the location.
 SECTION 6.  Subtitle C, Title 5, Business & Commerce Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 114 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 114.  THIRD-PARTY FOOD DELIVERY SERVICES
 Sec. 114.0001.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Mark" and "trade name" have the meanings assigned
 by Section 16.001.
 (2)  "Restaurant" has the meaning assigned by Section
 1.04, Alcoholic Beverage Code.
 (3)  "Third-party food delivery service" means a
 website, mobile application, or other service that acts as an
 intermediary between consumers and multiple restaurants not owned
 or operated by the service to arrange for the delivery or pickup of
 food or beverages from those restaurants.
 Sec. 114.0002.  PROHIBITED ACTS. A third-party food
 delivery service may not:
 (1)  arrange for the delivery or pickup of food or
 beverages from a restaurant in this state unless the service has
 filed a certificate of formation or registration with the secretary
 of state;
 (2)  use a restaurant's mark or trade name in connection
 with the service in a misleading way that suggests the restaurant
 sponsors or endorses the service;
 (3)  add a restaurant removed from the service under
 Section 114.0003 to the service unless the service has received
 written consent from the restaurant to add the restaurant to the
 service; or
 (4)  charge a restaurant a fee or require the
 restaurant to absorb a fee in connection with the service's
 arrangement of an order from that restaurant unless the restaurant
 has agreed to pay or absorb the fee under an agreement that meets
 the requirements of Section 114.0004.
 Sec. 114.0003.  REQUIREMENTS FOR SERVICE. A third-party
 food delivery service shall:
 (1)  provide a consumer a clearly identified mechanism
 for the consumer to express concerns or complaints directly to the
 service regarding an order arranged through the service; and
 (2)  remove a restaurant from the service not later
 than the 10th day after the date the service receives a request from
 the restaurant to be removed from the service if the service does
 not have an agreement with the restaurant that meets the
 requirements of Section 114.0004.
 Sec. 114.0004.  TERMS OF AGREEMENT WITH RESTAURANT. (a)  An
 agreement between a third-party food delivery service and a
 restaurant must:
 (1)  be in writing;
 (2)  expressly authorize the service to arrange for the
 delivery or pickup of food or beverages from that restaurant; and
 (3)  clearly state each fee, including a commission or
 other charge, that the restaurant will be required to pay to the
 service or absorb in connection with an order arranged through the
 service.
 (b)  The agreement may not include any provision that
 requires the restaurant to indemnify the third-party food delivery
 service, including an employee or independent contractor of the
 service, for claims or liabilities resulting from acts or omissions
 of the service or of an employee or independent contractor of the
 service.
 (c)  A provision in an agreement that violates Subsection (b)
 is void and unenforceable.
 Sec. 114.0005.  PRIVATE CAUSE OF ACTION. (a)  If a
 third-party food delivery service violates this chapter, a
 restaurant aggrieved by the violation may bring an action against
 the service for:
 (1)  injunctive relief; and
 (2)  damages in an amount equal to:
 (A)  the restaurant's actual damages arising from
 the violation; or
 (B)  the service's profits arising from the
 violation.
 (b)  If the court finds that the defendant committed the
 violation knowingly or in bad faith, the court may award the
 plaintiff:
 (1)  exemplary damages in an amount that is not more
 than three times the sum of:
 (A)  the plaintiff's actual damages; and
 (B)  the defendant's profits arising from the
 violation; and
 (2)  the plaintiff's reasonable attorney's fees.
 SECTION 7.  Chapter 250, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 250.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 250.011.  THIRD-PARTY FOOD DELIVERY SERVICES.  (a)  In
 this section, "third-party food delivery service" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 114.0001, Business & Commerce Code.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law, a municipality or county
 may not adopt or enforce an ordinance or regulation to the extent
 that the ordinance or regulation affects the terms of agreements
 between third-party food delivery services and restaurants that
 meet the requirements of Section 114.0004(a), Business & Commerce
 Code.
 SECTION 8.  Section 114.0004, Business & Commerce Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to an agreement entered into or
 renewed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2022.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 911 passed the Senate on
 April 9, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 911 passed the House on
 May 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 11, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor