Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB966 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 966


 AN ACT
 relating to legislative oversight during a public health disaster
 or public health emergency, including the establishment of a
 legislative public health oversight board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Subtitle D, Title 2, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBTITLE D.  PREVENTION, CONTROL, AND REPORTS OF DISEASES; PUBLIC
 HEALTH DISASTERS AND EMERGENCIES
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Chapter 81, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 81.  COMMUNICABLE DISEASES; PUBLIC HEALTH DISASTERS; PUBLIC
 HEALTH EMERGENCIES
 SECTION 3.  Section 81.003, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subdivision (7) and adding Subdivision (7-a) to
 read as follows:
 (7)  "Public health disaster" means:
 (A)  a declaration by the governor of a state of
 disaster; and
 (B)  a determination by the commissioner that
 there exists an immediate threat from a communicable disease,
 health condition, or chemical, biological, radiological, or
 electromagnetic exposure that:
 (i)  poses a high risk of death or serious
 harm [long-term disability] to the public [a large number of
 people]; and
 (ii)  creates a substantial risk of harmful
 public exposure [because of the disease's high level of contagion
 or the method by which the disease is transmitted].
 (7-a)  "Public health emergency" means a determination
 by the commissioner, evidenced in an emergency order issued by the
 commissioner, that there exists an immediate threat from a
 communicable disease, health condition, or chemical, biological,
 radiological, or electromagnetic exposure that:
 (A)  potentially poses a risk of death or severe
 illness or harm to the public; and
 (B)  potentially creates a substantial risk of
 harmful exposure to the public.
 SECTION 4.  The heading to Subchapter E, Chapter 81, Health
 and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E.  CONTROL; PUBLIC HEALTH DISASTERS; PUBLIC HEALTH
 EMERGENCIES
 SECTION 5.  Section 81.082, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (d) and adding Subsections (d-1) and
 (d-2) to read as follows:
 (d)  A declaration of a public health disaster or an order of
 public health emergency may continue for not more than 30 days after
 the date the disaster or emergency is declared or ordered by the
 commissioner. A public health disaster may be renewed [one time] by
 the legislature or by the commissioner with the approval of the
 legislative public health oversight board established under
 Section 81.0821 [commissioner] for an additional 30 days.  A public
 health emergency order may be renewed by the commissioner for an
 additional 30 days.  Each renewal period may not exceed 30 days.
 (d-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (d), if the legislature or
 the legislative public health oversight board is unable to meet to
 consider the renewal of a declaration of a public health disaster,
 the declaration shall continue until the legislature or board meets
 unless the declaration is terminated by the commissioner or
 governor.
 (d-2)  Not later than the seventh day after the date the
 commissioner issues an initial declaration of a public health
 disaster or an order of a public health emergency, the commissioner
 shall consult with the chairs of the standing committees of the
 senate and house of representatives with primary jurisdiction over
 public health regarding the disaster or emergency.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter E, Chapter 81, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 81.0821 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.0821.  LEGISLATIVE PUBLIC HEALTH OVERSIGHT BOARD.
 (a)  In this section, "board" means the legislative public health
 oversight board established under this section.
 (b)  The legislative public health oversight board is
 established to provide oversight for declarations of public health
 disasters and orders of public health emergencies issued by the
 commissioner under this chapter and perform other duties required
 by law.
 (c)  The board consists of the following members:
 (1)  the lieutenant governor;
 (2)  the speaker of the house of representatives;
 (3)  the chair of the Senate Committee on Finance or its
 successor;
 (4)  the chair of the Senate Committee on State Affairs
 or its successor;
 (5)  the chair of the Senate Committee on Health and
 Human Services or its successor;
 (6)  the chair of the Senate Committee on Education or
 its successor;
 (7)  the chair of the House Committee on Appropriations
 or its successor;
 (8)  the chair of the House Committee on State Affairs
 or its successor;
 (9)  the chair of the House Committee on Public Health
 or its successor;
 (10)  the chair of the House Committee on Public
 Education or its successor;
 (11)  two additional members of the senate appointed by
 the lieutenant governor; and
 (12)  two additional members of the house appointed by
 the speaker.
 (d)  The lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
 representatives are joint chairs of the board.
 (e)  A majority of the members of the board from each house of
 the legislature constitutes a quorum to transact business. If a
 quorum is present, the board by majority vote may act on any matter
 within the board's jurisdiction.
 (f)  The board shall meet as often as necessary to perform
 the board's duties. Meetings may be held at any time at the request
 of either chair or on written petition of a majority of the board
 members from each house of the legislature.
 (g)  The board shall meet in Austin, except that if a
 majority of the board members from each house of the legislature
 agree, the committee may meet in any location determined by the
 board.
 (h)  As an exception to Chapter 551, Government Code, and
 other law, for a meeting in Austin at which both joint chairs of the
 board are physically present, any number of the other board members
 may attend the meeting by use of telephone conference call, video
 conference call, or other similar telecommunication device.  This
 subsection applies for purposes of establishing a quorum or voting
 or any other purpose allowing the members to fully participate in
 any board meeting.  This subsection applies without regard to the
 subject or topics considered by the members at the meeting.
 (i)  A board meeting held by use of telephone conference
 call, video conference call, or other similar telecommunication
 device:
 (1)  is subject to the notice requirements applicable
 to other meetings;
 (2)  must specify in the notice of the meeting the
 location in Austin at which the joint chairs will be physically
 present;
 (3)  must be open to the public and audible to the
 public at the location specified in the notice under Subdivision
 (2); and
 (4)  must provide two-way audio communication between
 all board members attending the meeting during the entire meeting,
 and if the two-way audio communication link with any member
 attending the meeting is disrupted at any time, the meeting may not
 continue until the two-way audio communication link is
 reestablished.
 SECTION 7.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the lieutenant governor and the speaker of the house of
 representatives shall appoint the legislative members to the
 legislative public health oversight board as required by Section
 81.0821, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 966 passed the Senate on
 April 19, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 30, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 966 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 138,
 Nays 7, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor