Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB966 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 17, 2021
Analysis May 20, 2021
Analysis April 2, 2021
Analysis March 19, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 31, 2021
Fiscal Note April 2, 2021
Fiscal Note March 21, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2021
Bill April 7, 2021