Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB984 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 22, 2021
Analysis May 17, 2021
Analysis April 19, 2021
Analysis March 27, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2021
Bill April 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2021
Fiscal Note April 19, 2021
Fiscal Note March 30, 2021