Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB984 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/31/2021

                            S.B. No. 984


 AN ACT
 relating to public health disaster and public health emergency
 preparedness and response, including the operation of the Task
 Force on Infectious Disease Preparedness and Response.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 81, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 81.027 to read as follows:
 Sec. 81.027.  TRAUMA SERVICE AREA REGIONAL ADVISORY COUNCIL
 DATA COLLECTION AND REPORTING. (a) Each trauma service area
 regional advisory council shall collect from each hospital located
 in the regional advisory council's trauma service area the
 de-identified health care data, including demographic data,
 necessary for this state and the area to effectively plan for and
 respond to public health disasters and communicable or infectious
 disease emergencies in this state. The executive commissioner by
 rule shall prescribe the data each council must collect under this
 subsection.
 (b)  A trauma service area regional advisory council shall:
 (1)  provide the data collected under Subsection (a) to
 the department; and
 (2)  make the data publicly available by:
 (A)  posting the data on the regional advisory
 council's Internet website; or
 (B)  if the regional advisory council does not
 maintain an Internet website, providing the data in writing on
 request.
 (c)  Information collected or maintained under this section
 that identifies a patient is confidential and exempt from
 disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  Section 81.404(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The governor may appoint members of the task force as
 necessary, including members from relevant state agencies, members
 with expertise in infectious diseases and other issues involved in
 the prevention of the spread of infectious diseases, and members
 from institutions of higher education in this state. The governor
 shall appoint to the task force:
 (1)  at least one member who is a county judge of a
 county with a population of less than 100,000;
 (2)  at least one member who is a county judge of a
 county with a population of 100,000 or more;
 (3)  at least one member who is a representative of a
 local health authority serving a rural area;
 (4)  at least one member who is a representative of a
 local health authority serving an urban area;
 (5)  at least one member who is a licensed nurse; [and]
 (6)  at least one member who is emergency medical
 services personnel, as defined by Section 773.003; and
 (7)  at least one member who is an epidemiologist.
 SECTION 3.  Section 81.406(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The task force shall meet:
 (1)  at least once each year at a location determined by
 the task force director; and
 (2)  at other times and locations as determined by the
 task force director [of the task force].
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 1, 2022, the governor
 shall appoint the member of the Task Force on Infectious Disease
 Preparedness and Response as required by Section 81.404(a)(7),
 Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  The Department of State Health Services or a
 trauma service area regional advisory council is required to
 implement Section 81.027, Health and Safety Code, as added by this
 Act, only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for
 that purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money
 specifically for that purpose, the department or a trauma service
 area regional advisory council may, but is not required to,
 implement Section 81.027 using other appropriations available for
 that purpose.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2021.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 984 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 984 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144,
 Nays 3, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor