4 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 9 | | relating to public health disaster and public health emergency |
---|
6 | 10 | | preparedness and response, including the operation of the Task |
---|
7 | 11 | | Force on Infectious Disease Preparedness and Response. |
---|
8 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 81, Health and Safety |
---|
10 | 14 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 81.027 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 15 | | Sec. 81.027. TRAUMA SERVICE AREA REGIONAL ADVISORY COUNCIL |
---|
12 | 16 | | DATA COLLECTION AND REPORTING. (a) Each trauma service area |
---|
13 | 17 | | regional advisory council shall collect from each hospital located |
---|
14 | 18 | | in the regional advisory council's trauma service area the |
---|
15 | 19 | | de-identified health care data, including demographic data, |
---|
16 | 20 | | necessary for this state and the area to effectively plan for and |
---|
17 | 21 | | respond to public health disasters and communicable or infectious |
---|
18 | 22 | | disease emergencies in this state. The executive commissioner by |
---|
19 | 23 | | rule shall prescribe the data each council must collect under this |
---|
20 | 24 | | subsection. |
---|
21 | 25 | | (b) A trauma service area regional advisory council shall: |
---|
22 | 26 | | (1) provide the data collected under Subsection (a) to |
---|
23 | 27 | | the department; and |
---|
24 | 28 | | (2) make the data publicly available by: |
---|
25 | 29 | | (A) posting the data on the regional advisory |
---|
26 | 30 | | council's Internet website; or |
---|
27 | 31 | | (B) if the regional advisory council does not |
---|
28 | 32 | | maintain an Internet website, providing the data in writing on |
---|
29 | 33 | | request. |
---|
30 | 34 | | (c) Information collected or maintained under this section |
---|
31 | 35 | | that identifies a patient is confidential and exempt from |
---|
32 | 36 | | disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code. |
---|
33 | 37 | | SECTION 2. Section 81.404(a), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
34 | 38 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
35 | 39 | | (a) The governor may appoint members of the task force as |
---|
36 | 40 | | necessary, including members from relevant state agencies, members |
---|
37 | 41 | | with expertise in infectious diseases and other issues involved in |
---|
38 | 42 | | the prevention of the spread of infectious diseases, and members |
---|
39 | 43 | | from institutions of higher education in this state. The governor |
---|
40 | 44 | | shall appoint to the task force: |
---|
41 | 45 | | (1) at least one member who is a county judge of a |
---|
42 | 46 | | county with a population of less than 100,000; |
---|
43 | 47 | | (2) at least one member who is a county judge of a |
---|
44 | 48 | | county with a population of 100,000 or more; |
---|
45 | 49 | | (3) at least one member who is a representative of a |
---|
46 | 50 | | local health authority serving a rural area; |
---|
47 | 51 | | (4) at least one member who is a representative of a |
---|
48 | 52 | | local health authority serving an urban area; |
---|
49 | 53 | | (5) at least one member who is a licensed nurse; [and] |
---|
50 | 54 | | (6) at least one member who is emergency medical |
---|
51 | 55 | | services personnel, as defined by Section 773.003; and |
---|
52 | 56 | | (7) at least one member who is an epidemiologist. |
---|
53 | 57 | | SECTION 3. Section 81.406(a), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
54 | 58 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
55 | 59 | | (a) The task force shall meet: |
---|
56 | 60 | | (1) at least once each year at a location determined by |
---|
57 | 61 | | the task force director; and |
---|
58 | 62 | | (2) at other times and locations as determined by the |
---|
59 | 63 | | task force director [of the task force]. |
---|
60 | 64 | | SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2022, the governor |
---|
61 | 65 | | shall appoint the member of the Task Force on Infectious Disease |
---|
62 | 66 | | Preparedness and Response as required by Section 81.404(a)(7), |
---|
63 | 67 | | Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
64 | 68 | | SECTION 5. The Department of State Health Services or a |
---|
65 | 69 | | trauma service area regional advisory council is required to |
---|
66 | 70 | | implement Section 81.027, Health and Safety Code, as added by this |
---|
67 | 71 | | Act, only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for |
---|
68 | 72 | | that purpose. If the legislature does not appropriate money |
---|
69 | 73 | | specifically for that purpose, the department or a trauma service |
---|
70 | 74 | | area regional advisory council may, but is not required to, |
---|
71 | 75 | | implement Section 81.027 using other appropriations available for |
---|
72 | 76 | | that purpose. |
---|
73 | 77 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2021. |
---|
74 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
75 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
76 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 984 passed the Senate on |
---|
77 | | - | April 29, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that |
---|
78 | | - | the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 29, 2021, by the |
---|
79 | | - | following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
80 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
81 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
82 | | - | I hereby certify that S.B. No. 984 passed the House, with |
---|
83 | | - | amendment, on May 26, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 144, |
---|
84 | | - | Nays 3, one present not voting. |
---|
85 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
86 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
87 | | - | Approved: |
---|
88 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Date |
---|
90 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
91 | | - | Governor |
---|