06/16/2021 | Signed by the Governor | |||
05/24/2021 | Sent to the Governor | |||
House | 05/24/2021 | Signed in the House | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Signed in the Senate | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 05/24/2021 | House passage reported | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Record vote RV#1294 | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Laid before the House | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Placed on Resolutions Calendar | ||
House | 05/20/2021 | Adopted | ||
House | 05/17/2021 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2021 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/29/2021 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2021 | Referred to State Affairs | ||
House | 04/21/2021 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/20/2021 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/14/2021 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/09/2021 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/08/2021 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/18/2021 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |