Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR12 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis July 12, 2021
Analysis April 6, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2021
Bill April 9, 2021