Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR31 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 12, 2021

Engrossed

Bill May 19, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 24, 2021
Analysis May 11, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill May 24, 2021
Bill May 14, 2021