Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR31 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/30/2021

                            S.C.R. No. 31


 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION
 WHEREAS, Plaintiffs Dorena Coleman, Curtis Jackson, and
 Federico Perez, individually, (collectively referred to as
 "Plaintiffs"), filed suit on August 13, 2020, against the Texas
 Health and Human Services Commission, including employees in their
 official capacities ("HHSC"), and sought relief both on Plaintiffs'
 own behalf and on behalf of a class of similarly situated
 individuals ("Medicaid HCV Class"), and filed a motion for class
 certification on August 14, 2020; and
 WHEREAS, Plaintiffs alleged HHSC's Prior Authorization
 Criteria and Policy's use of fibrosis score as criterion for direct
 action antiviral drug (DAA) coverage violated Title XIX of the
 Social Security Act:
 (a)  By discriminating among similarly situated Medicaid
 recipients on the basis of categorical restrictions that are not
 based upon prevailing clinical standards, as prohibited by 42
 U.S.C. § 1396a(a)(10)(B)(i) and (ii) and 42 C.F.R. § 440.240;
 (b)  By denying qualified Medicaid participants the
 provision of necessary medical assistance and treatment coverage
 with "reasonable promptness," as required by 42 U.S.C. §
 1396a(a)(8);
 (c)  By excluding qualified Medicaid recipients from
 medically necessary treatment coverage as required by 42 U.S.C. §
 1396a(a)(10)(A); and
 WHEREAS, Defendants denied the allegations of the Lawsuit,
 denied all allegations of wrongdoing and liability, and denied any
 causation of harm or damage to the Medicaid HCV Class; and
 WHEREAS, The parties mediated this matter on December 1,
 2020, with the Honorable Patrick Keel as mediator, and thereafter
 successfully reached an agreement in principle on December 17,
 2020; and
 WHEREAS, The Parties have now agreed to a full settlement on
 the following terms:
 (a)  HHSC will modify its Medicaid prior authorization (PA)
 criteria to treat chronic Hepatitis C clients who have METAVIR
 fibrosis scores of F2-F4 with Direct Acting Antiviral (DAA)
 treatment by March 1, 2021;
 (b)  Between March 1, 2021, and September 1, 2021, Medicaid
 enrollees with severe extrahepatic effects of chronic Hepatitis C
 who have fibrosis scores other than F2-F4 will be approved for DAA
 treatment on a case-by-case basis by the HHSC Chief Medical
 Director or an MCO Medical Director, if they are assigned to an MCO;
 (c)  As of September 1, 2021, HHSC will remove all METAVIR
 fibrosis score, drug screening, and specialist prescription PA
 criteria requirements for DAA treatment for chronic Hepatitis C
 clients, if the legislature approves the funding for HHSC's
 Exceptional Item (EI); HHSC agrees that, for the period September
 1, 2021, through August 31, 2023, HHSC will not reinstate these
 criteria; and
 WHEREAS, This Agreement is expressly conditioned upon
 approval by the Office of the Attorney General of Texas, the
 Governor of Texas, and the Texas Legislature; and
 WHEREAS, This Agreement is expressly conditioned upon
 enactment by the Texas Legislature of the EI requested by HHSC; and
 WHEREAS, Section 111.003(b), Texas Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, requires a state agency to obtain legislative
 approval of a settlement agreement that "commits this state to a
 course of action that in reasonable probability will entail a
 continuing increased expenditure of state funds over subsequent
 state fiscal bienniums"; therefore, the Settlement Agreement is
 expressly conditioned upon the legislature approving and
 appropriating the agreed upon settlement amount; now, therefore, be
 it
 RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas
 hereby approve the proposed Settlement Agreement.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 31 was adopted by the Senate
 on May 19, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.C.R. No. 31 was adopted by the House
 on May 29, 2021, by the following vote:  Yeas 133, Nays 0,
 one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor