2 | 3 | | |
---|
3 | 4 | | |
---|
4 | 5 | | SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION |
---|
5 | 6 | | WHEREAS, Plaintiffs Dorena Coleman, Curtis Jackson, and |
---|
6 | 7 | | Federico Perez, individually, (collectively referred to as |
---|
7 | 8 | | "Plaintiffs"), filed suit on August 13, 2020, against the Texas |
---|
8 | 9 | | Health and Human Services Commission, including employees in their |
---|
9 | 10 | | official capacities ("HHSC"), and sought relief both on Plaintiffs' |
---|
10 | 11 | | own behalf and on behalf of a class of similarly situated |
---|
11 | 12 | | individuals ("Medicaid HCV Class"), and filed a motion for class |
---|
12 | 13 | | certification on August 14, 2020; and |
---|
13 | 14 | | WHEREAS, Plaintiffs alleged HHSC's Prior Authorization |
---|
14 | 15 | | Criteria and Policy's use of fibrosis score as criterion for direct |
---|
15 | 16 | | action antiviral drug (DAA) coverage violated Title XIX of the |
---|
16 | 17 | | Social Security Act: |
---|
17 | 18 | | (a) By discriminating among similarly situated Medicaid |
---|
18 | 19 | | recipients on the basis of categorical restrictions that are not |
---|
19 | 20 | | based upon prevailing clinical standards, as prohibited by 42 |
---|
20 | 21 | | U.S.C. § 1396a(a)(10)(B)(i) and (ii) and 42 C.F.R. § 440.240; |
---|
21 | 22 | | (b) By denying qualified Medicaid participants the |
---|
22 | 23 | | provision of necessary medical assistance and treatment coverage |
---|
23 | 24 | | with "reasonable promptness," as required by 42 U.S.C. § |
---|
24 | 25 | | 1396a(a)(8); |
---|
25 | 26 | | (c) By excluding qualified Medicaid recipients from |
---|
26 | 27 | | medically necessary treatment coverage as required by 42 U.S.C. § |
---|
27 | 28 | | 1396a(a)(10)(A); and |
---|
28 | 29 | | WHEREAS, Defendants denied the allegations of the Lawsuit, |
---|
29 | 30 | | denied all allegations of wrongdoing and liability, and denied any |
---|
30 | 31 | | causation of harm or damage to the Medicaid HCV Class; and |
---|
31 | 32 | | WHEREAS, The parties mediated this matter on December 1, |
---|
32 | 33 | | 2020, with the Honorable Patrick Keel as mediator, and thereafter |
---|
33 | 34 | | successfully reached an agreement in principle on December 17, |
---|
34 | 35 | | 2020; and |
---|
35 | 36 | | WHEREAS, The Parties have now agreed to a full settlement on |
---|
36 | 37 | | the following terms: |
---|
37 | 38 | | (a) HHSC will modify its Medicaid prior authorization (PA) |
---|
38 | 39 | | criteria to treat chronic Hepatitis C clients who have METAVIR |
---|
39 | 40 | | fibrosis scores of F2-F4 with Direct Acting Antiviral (DAA) |
---|
40 | 41 | | treatment by March 1, 2021; |
---|
41 | 42 | | (b) Between March 1, 2021, and September 1, 2021, Medicaid |
---|
42 | 43 | | enrollees with severe extrahepatic effects of chronic Hepatitis C |
---|
43 | 44 | | who have fibrosis scores other than F2-F4 will be approved for DAA |
---|
44 | 45 | | treatment on a case-by-case basis by the HHSC Chief Medical |
---|
45 | 46 | | Director or an MCO Medical Director, if they are assigned to an MCO; |
---|
46 | 47 | | (c) As of September 1, 2021, HHSC will remove all METAVIR |
---|
47 | 48 | | fibrosis score, drug screening, and specialist prescription PA |
---|
48 | 49 | | criteria requirements for DAA treatment for chronic Hepatitis C |
---|
49 | 50 | | clients, if the legislature approves the funding for HHSC's |
---|
50 | 51 | | Exceptional Item (EI); HHSC agrees that, for the period September |
---|
51 | 52 | | 1, 2021, through August 31, 2023, HHSC will not reinstate these |
---|
52 | 53 | | criteria; and |
---|
53 | 54 | | WHEREAS, This Agreement is expressly conditioned upon |
---|
54 | 55 | | approval by the Office of the Attorney General of Texas, the |
---|
55 | 56 | | Governor of Texas, and the Texas Legislature; and |
---|
56 | 57 | | WHEREAS, This Agreement is expressly conditioned upon |
---|
57 | 58 | | enactment by the Texas Legislature of the EI requested by HHSC; and |
---|
58 | 59 | | WHEREAS, Section 111.003(b), Texas Civil Practice and |
---|
59 | 60 | | Remedies Code, requires a state agency to obtain legislative |
---|
60 | 61 | | approval of a settlement agreement that "commits this state to a |
---|
61 | 62 | | course of action that in reasonable probability will entail a |
---|
62 | 63 | | continuing increased expenditure of state funds over subsequent |
---|
63 | 64 | | state fiscal bienniums"; therefore, the Settlement Agreement is |
---|
64 | 65 | | expressly conditioned upon the legislature approving and |
---|
65 | 66 | | appropriating the agreed upon settlement amount; now, therefore, be |
---|
66 | 67 | | it |
---|
67 | 68 | | RESOLVED, That the 87th Legislature of the State of Texas |
---|
68 | 69 | | hereby approve the proposed Settlement Agreement. |
---|