Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR19 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2020

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 4, 2021
Analysis April 29, 2021
Analysis March 11, 2021
Analysis March 8, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2021
Bill March 15, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2021
Fiscal Note March 11, 2021
Fiscal Note March 6, 2021