Texas 2021 - 87th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR19 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/28/2021

                            S.J.R. No. 19


 proposing a constitutional amendment establishing a right for
 residents of certain facilities to designate an essential caregiver
 for in-person visitation.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article I, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 35 to read as follows:
 Sec. 35.  (a) A resident of a nursing facility, assisted
 living facility, intermediate care facility for individuals with an
 intellectual disability, residence providing home and
 community-based services, or state supported living center, as
 those terms are defined by general law, has the right to designate
 an essential caregiver with whom the facility, residence, or center
 may not prohibit in-person visitation.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a) of this section, the
 legislature by general law may provide guidelines for a facility,
 residence, or center described by Subsection (a) of this section to
 follow in establishing essential caregiver visitation policies and
 procedures.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 2, 2021.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment establishing a right
 for residents of certain facilities to designate an essential
 caregiver for in-person visitation."
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 19 was adopted by the Senate
 on March 17, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2021, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 19 was adopted by the House,
 with amendment, on May 24, 2021, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Received:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Secretary of State