|
10/25/2021
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
|
10/25/2021
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
10/18/2021
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
10/18/2021
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/18/2021
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/15/2021
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/15/2021
|
House recedes from amendments-reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#100
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
House recedes from amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/15/2021
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#98
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#88
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#87
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amended 3-Bonnen
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#86
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 2-Anchia
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Record vote RV#85
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-Anchia
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2021
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2021
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2021
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2021
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
10/11/2021
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2021
|
Referred to Redistricting
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2021
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
10/06/2021
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA2 Gutierrez
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Amendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/04/2021
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/28/2021
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2021
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/25/2021
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Referred to Redistricting, Special
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2021
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|