Texas 2021 - 87th 3rd C.S.

Texas Senate Bill SB7 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 20, 2021

Engrossed

Bill October 5, 2021

Enrolled

Bill October 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis October 19, 2021
Analysis October 12, 2021
Analysis September 20, 2021

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note October 15, 2021
Fiscal Note October 9, 2021
Fiscal Note September 22, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill October 12, 2021
Bill September 28, 2021