Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2242
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1701
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3587
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1354
|
Journal Page: 3586
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3586
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3586
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3449
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3449
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 423
|
House
|
12/29/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|