Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1136 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2022
Bill December 29, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 27, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Bill May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023