Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1171 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/20/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 S Referred to Education
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/25/2023 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Transportation
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/25/2023 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Signed by the Governor
03/28/2023 2:00 pm
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Postponed
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Local Government
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/24/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/18/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23