LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB1435
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1435
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1435
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/05/2023
10:30 am
County Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB2542
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
HB4775
Introduced
Last Action: 04/05/2023 H No action taken in committee
HB4844
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1775
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/21/2023 S Left pending in committee
HB3456
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
HB4928
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
HB2584
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB1435
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/18/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB2730
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
HB4171
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB4771
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to Local Government