LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB1507
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1507
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1507
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/28/2023
8:00 am
Public Education Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.036
HB681
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S Returned from the House for further action
HB1263
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1507
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB1959
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
HB2012
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
HB2209
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E See remarks for effective date
HB2234
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Education
HB2647
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Referred to Education
HB2890
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2892
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective immediately
HB3803
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
HCR90
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call