Senate | 05/24/2023 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 2757 | |
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2242 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2129 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1304 | |
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1304 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1198 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#360 | Journal Page: 1751 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1751 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1697 | |
House | 04/19/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 913 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1304 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 459 | |
House | 01/23/2023 | Filed |