Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1518 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023
Bill January 23, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 24, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023