Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1518 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/19/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Darby (Senate Sponsor - Parker) H.B. No. 1518
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2023;
 April 25, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the examination of appraisal services for an appraisal
 management company.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1104.153, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1104.153.  APPRAISAL SERVICES EXAMINATION [REVIEW].
 (a)  A person who examines the work of appraisers performing
 appraisal services [performs an appraisal review] for an appraisal
 management company as required by Section 1104.155 must be
 knowledgeable of appraisal practice and the Uniform Standards of
 Professional Appraisal Practice[:
 [(1)  licensed as an appraiser under Chapter 1103,
 unless exempt by board rule; and
 [(2)  qualified to perform the appraisal being
 reviewed].
 (b)  An appraisal management company registered under this
 chapter shall keep a record of the qualifications of a person
 conducting an examination described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  Section 1104.155, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1104.155.  PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS. An appraisal
 management company registered under this chapter shall on a
 periodic basis examine [perform an appraisal review of] the work of
 appraisers performing appraisal services for the company to ensure
 that the services comply with:
 (1)  the edition of the Uniform Standards of
 Professional Appraisal Practice in effect at the time of the
 appraisal; or
 (2)  other standards prescribed by board rule.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *