Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1620 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2023
Bill March 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 10, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023

Engrossed

Analysis May 16, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 23, 2023
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 29, 2023
Bill May 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 23, 2023
Bill April 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023