1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 1620 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the review date for certain governmental entities |
---|
6 | 6 | | subject to the sunset review process and the regulation of horse |
---|
7 | 7 | | racing by the Texas Racing Commission. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 443.002, Government Code, is amended to |
---|
10 | 10 | | read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 443.002. SUNSET PROVISION. The State Preservation |
---|
12 | 12 | | Board is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless |
---|
13 | 13 | | continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the board is |
---|
14 | 14 | | abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2029 [2025]. |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 2. Section 444.002(a), Government Code, is amended |
---|
16 | 16 | | to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (a) The Texas Commission on the Arts is subject to Chapter |
---|
18 | 18 | | 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided |
---|
19 | 19 | | by that chapter, the commission is abolished and this chapter |
---|
20 | 20 | | expires September 1, 2029 [2025]. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 3. Section 467.002, Government Code, is amended to |
---|
22 | 22 | | read as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | Sec. 467.002. APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The commission is |
---|
24 | 24 | | subject to review under Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless |
---|
25 | 25 | | continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the commission |
---|
26 | 26 | | is abolished and this chapter, Chapter 466 of this code, and Chapter |
---|
27 | 27 | | 2001, Occupations Code, expire September 1, 2025. |
---|
28 | 28 | | SECTION 4. Section 659.140(i), Government Code, is amended |
---|
29 | 29 | | to read as follows: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (i) The state employee charitable campaign policy committee |
---|
31 | 31 | | is subject to the Texas Sunset Act. Unless continued in existence |
---|
32 | 32 | | as provided by that chapter, the committee is abolished and this |
---|
33 | 33 | | subchapter [Government Code, Chapter 659, Subchapter I,] and |
---|
34 | 34 | | Sections 814.0095 and 814.0096 expire on September 1, 2029 [2025]. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 5. Section 2021.008, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
36 | 36 | | by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as |
---|
37 | 37 | | follows: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (a) The commission is subject to Chapter 325, Government |
---|
39 | 39 | | Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided |
---|
40 | 40 | | by that chapter, and except as provided by Subsections (b) and (c), |
---|
41 | 41 | | the commission is abolished and this subtitle expires September 1, |
---|
42 | 42 | | 2029 [2027]. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (a-1) As part of the review under Subsection (a), the Sunset |
---|
44 | 44 | | Advisory Commission shall review: |
---|
45 | 45 | | (1) the impact on the commission of authorizing the |
---|
46 | 46 | | executive director to apply for and receive grants to implement or |
---|
47 | 47 | | enforce this subtitle; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (2) the effect of increasing the amount of |
---|
49 | 49 | | unappropriated money remaining in the Texas Racing Commission fund |
---|
50 | 50 | | at the close of each state fiscal biennium that is transferred to |
---|
51 | 51 | | the general revenue fund; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (3) the effect of complying with Chapter 53 in the |
---|
53 | 53 | | administration of the commission's licensing program; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (4) the effect of requiring reimbursement of general |
---|
55 | 55 | | revenue appropriated to the commission for the administration and |
---|
56 | 56 | | enforcement of this subtitle that exceeds the cumulative amount |
---|
57 | 57 | | deposited in the Texas Racing Commission fund; and |
---|
58 | 58 | | (5) the commission's authority to issue a temporary |
---|
59 | 59 | | license to an applicant whose application appears to comply with |
---|
60 | 60 | | the requirements of law. |
---|
61 | 61 | | SECTION 6. Subchapter B, Chapter 2022, Occupations Code, is |
---|
62 | 62 | | amended by adding Section 2022.0515 to read as follows: |
---|
63 | 63 | | Sec. 2022.0515. GRANTS. The executive director may apply |
---|
64 | 64 | | for and receive any grant applicable to the implementation or |
---|
65 | 65 | | enforcement of this subtitle or a rule adopted under this subtitle. |
---|
66 | 66 | | SECTION 7. Section 2023.053(c), Occupations Code, is |
---|
67 | 67 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
68 | 68 | | (c) Any unappropriated money exceeding $2 million |
---|
69 | 69 | | [$750,000] that remains in the fund at the close of each state |
---|
70 | 70 | | fiscal biennium shall be transferred to the general revenue fund |
---|
71 | 71 | | and may be appropriated for any purpose. |
---|
72 | 72 | | SECTION 8. Section 2025.001, Occupations Code, is amended |
---|
73 | 73 | | by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
74 | 74 | | (a-1) The commission shall comply with Chapter 53 in the |
---|
75 | 75 | | administration of the commission's licensing program. |
---|
76 | 76 | | SECTION 9. The following provisions of the Occupations Code |
---|
77 | 77 | | are repealed: |
---|
78 | 78 | | (1) Section 2023.053(e); and |
---|
79 | 79 | | (2) Section 2025.260. |
---|
80 | 80 | | SECTION 10. It is the intent of the legislature that the |
---|
81 | 81 | | Sunset Advisory Commission review the Texas Lottery Commission |
---|
82 | 82 | | during the period in which the Sunset Advisory Commission reviews |
---|
83 | 83 | | state agencies abolished in 2025, and this Act controls over Senate |
---|
84 | 84 | | Bill No. 1659, Acts of the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023, |
---|
85 | 85 | | or any other Act of the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023, |
---|
86 | 86 | | that amends Section 467.002, Government Code, changing the sunset |
---|
87 | 87 | | date of the Texas Lottery Commission to a date other than September |
---|
88 | 88 | | 1, 2025, without regard to the relative dates of enactment. |
---|
89 | 89 | | SECTION 11. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
90 | 90 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
91 | 91 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
92 | 92 | | I certify that H.B. No. 1620 was passed by the House on May 2, |
---|
93 | 93 | | 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 4, 1 present, not |
---|
94 | 94 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
95 | 95 | | No. 1620 on May 28, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 9, |
---|
96 | 96 | | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
97 | 97 | | ______________________________ |
---|
98 | 98 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
99 | 99 | | I certify that H.B. No. 1620 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
100 | 100 | | amendments, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
101 | 101 | | 0. |
---|
102 | 102 | | ______________________________ |
---|
103 | 103 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
104 | 104 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
105 | 105 | | Date |
---|
106 | 106 | | __________________ |
---|
107 | 107 | | Governor |
---|