Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1620 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/29/2023

                            H.B. No. 1620


 AN ACT
 relating to the review date for certain governmental entities
 subject to the sunset review process and the regulation of horse
 racing by the Texas Racing Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 443.002, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 443.002.  SUNSET PROVISION. The State Preservation
 Board is subject to Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the board is
 abolished and this chapter expires September 1, 2029 [2025].
 SECTION 2.  Section 444.002(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  The Texas Commission on the Arts is subject to Chapter
 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, the commission is abolished and this chapter
 expires September 1, 2029 [2025].
 SECTION 3.  Section 467.002, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 467.002.  APPLICATION OF SUNSET ACT. The commission is
 subject to review under Chapter 325 (Texas Sunset Act). Unless
 continued in existence as provided by that chapter, the commission
 is abolished and this chapter, Chapter 466 of this code, and Chapter
 2001, Occupations Code, expire September 1, 2025.
 SECTION 4.  Section 659.140(i), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (i)  The state employee charitable campaign policy committee
 is subject to the Texas Sunset Act. Unless continued in existence
 as provided by that chapter, the committee is abolished and this
 subchapter [Government Code, Chapter 659, Subchapter I,] and
 Sections 814.0095 and 814.0096 expire on September 1, 2029 [2025].
 SECTION 5.  Section 2021.008, Occupations Code, is amended
 by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  The commission is subject to Chapter 325, Government
 Code (Texas Sunset Act). Unless continued in existence as provided
 by that chapter, and except as provided by Subsections (b) and (c),
 the commission is abolished and this subtitle expires September 1,
 2029 [2027].
 (a-1)  As part of the review under Subsection (a), the Sunset
 Advisory Commission shall review:
 (1)  the impact on the commission of authorizing the
 executive director to apply for and receive grants to implement or
 enforce this subtitle;
 (2)  the effect of increasing the amount of
 unappropriated money remaining in the Texas Racing Commission fund
 at the close of each state fiscal biennium that is transferred to
 the general revenue fund;
 (3)  the effect of complying with Chapter 53 in the
 administration of the commission's licensing program;
 (4)  the effect of requiring reimbursement of general
 revenue appropriated to the commission for the administration and
 enforcement of this subtitle that exceeds the cumulative amount
 deposited in the Texas Racing Commission fund; and
 (5)  the commission's authority to issue a temporary
 license to an applicant whose application appears to comply with
 the requirements of law.
 SECTION 6.  Subchapter B, Chapter 2022, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2022.0515 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2022.0515.  GRANTS. The executive director may apply
 for and receive any grant applicable to the implementation or
 enforcement of this subtitle or a rule adopted under this subtitle.
 SECTION 7.  Section 2023.053(c), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Any unappropriated money exceeding $2 million
 [$750,000] that remains in the fund at the close of each state
 fiscal biennium shall be transferred to the general revenue fund
 and may be appropriated for any purpose.
 SECTION 8.  Section 2025.001, Occupations Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The commission shall comply with Chapter 53 in the
 administration of the commission's licensing program.
 SECTION 9.  The following provisions of the Occupations Code
 are repealed:
 (1)  Section 2023.053(e); and
 (2)  Section 2025.260.
 SECTION 10.  It is the intent of the legislature that the
 Sunset Advisory Commission review the Texas Lottery Commission
 during the period in which the Sunset Advisory Commission reviews
 state agencies abolished in 2025, and this Act controls over Senate
 Bill No. 1659, Acts of the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023,
 or any other Act of the 88th Legislature, Regular Session, 2023,
 that amends Section 467.002, Government Code, changing the sunset
 date of the Texas Lottery Commission to a date other than September
 1, 2025, without regard to the relative dates of enactment.
 SECTION 11.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1620 was passed by the House on May 2,
 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 4, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1620 on May 28, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 129, Nays 9,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1620 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor