Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1793
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1648
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#306
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1647
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1613
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1192
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 493
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|