1 | 1 | | By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1646 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2023; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 20, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water, |
---|
4 | 4 | | Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 21, 2023, reported adversely, |
---|
5 | 5 | | with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, |
---|
6 | 6 | | Nays 0; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
8 | 8 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1646 By: Perry |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | |
---|
11 | 11 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
12 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
13 | 13 | | relating to the use of water withdrawn from the Edwards Aquifer. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 1.34(b), Chapter 626, Acts of the 73rd |
---|
16 | 16 | | Legislature, Regular Session, 1993, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (b) Water withdrawn from the aquifer must be used within: |
---|
18 | 18 | | (1) the boundaries of the authority; or |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) the geographic area of a certificate of |
---|
20 | 20 | | convenience and necessity: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (A) as the certificate of convenience and |
---|
22 | 22 | | necessity existed on September 1, 2023; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | (B) any part of which was located within the |
---|
24 | 24 | | boundaries of the authority on June 28, 1996. |
---|
25 | 25 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|
26 | 26 | | * * * * * |
---|