Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1646 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 05/21/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1646
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2023;
 April 20, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 21, 2023, reported adversely,
 with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 21, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1646 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of water withdrawn from the Edwards Aquifer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1.34(b), Chapter 626, Acts of the 73rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 1993, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Water withdrawn from the aquifer must be used within:
 (1)  the boundaries of the authority; or
 (2)  the geographic area of a certificate of
 convenience and necessity:
 (A)  as the certificate of convenience and
 necessity existed on September 1, 2023; and
 (B)  any part of which was located within the
 boundaries of the authority on June 28, 1996.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *