Senate | 05/18/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1072 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1709 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1553 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Record vote | RV#245 | Journal Page: 1552 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 1552 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Amended | 1-Burns | Journal Page: 1552 |
House | 04/18/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1518 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1518 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1484 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 494 | |
House | 01/26/2023 | Filed |