Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1662 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 4, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 17, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 17, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023