Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1686 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/27/2023 8:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/14/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/27/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar