Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3006
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3006
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3006
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/26/2023
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5659
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5295
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 973
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1476
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#199
|
Journal Page: 1476
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1476
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1476
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1462
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1286
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1484
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 503
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|