Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1771 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2023
Bill January 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 15, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Fiscal Note
Bill

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 25, 2023
Fiscal Note May 21, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023
Fiscal Note March 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023