Senate | 04/13/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 967 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1409 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Record vote | RV#176 | Journal Page: 1408 |
House | 04/13/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1408 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1408 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1368 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#167 | Journal Page: 1367 |
House | 04/12/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1367 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1367 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 813 | |
House | 03/14/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 302 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 302 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |