Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB180 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2022
Bill November 15, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023