Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1036
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1709
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#254
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#226
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1523
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Point of order sustained (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 1522
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 1522
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1522
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 975
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 513
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|