Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1898 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 29, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 15, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 21, 2023
Analysis May 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill March 29, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 21, 2023
Analysis May 16, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 19, 2023