Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1900 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 16, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis April 28, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Senate Amendments Printing

Analysis
Bill
Fiscal Note

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note March 9, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill April 16, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis April 28, 2023
Analysis April 14, 2023