Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1900 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/20/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 1900


 AN ACT
 relating to notice of cancellation or nonrenewal of a property and
 casualty insurance policy.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 551.104(f), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (f)  An insurer may cancel a personal automobile insurance
 policy effective on any 12-month anniversary of the original
 effective date of the policy if the insurer mails to the named
 insured written notice of the cancellation not later than the 60th
 [30th] day before the effective date of the cancellation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 551.105, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 551.105.  NONRENEWAL OF POLICIES; NOTICE REQUIRED.
 Unless the insurer has mailed written notice of nonrenewal or
 renewal with written notice of change in coverage as provided by
 Section 2002.001 to the insured not later than the 60th [30th] day
 before the date on which the insurance policy expires, an insurer
 must renew an insurance policy, at the request of the insured, on
 the expiration of the policy. Notwithstanding the failure of an
 insurer to comply with this section, the policy shall terminate on
 the effective date of any replacement or succeeding insurance
 policy with another carrier with respect to the insured
 (a)  personal automobile, (b)  home, farm, ranch, dwelling,
 duplex, or apartment, or (c)  other real or personal property.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an insurance policy that is delivered, issued for delivery, or
 renewed on or after January 1, 2024. A policy delivered, issued for
 delivery, or renewed before January 1, 2024, is governed by the law
 as it existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
 that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1900 was passed by the House on April
 21, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 139, Nays 2, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 1900 on May 19, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 136, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 1900 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 17, 2023, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor