E | 05/27/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 05/27/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6429 | |
E | 05/16/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4564 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4384 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4387 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4314 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1890 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1890 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1890 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1890 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1890 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1890 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1890 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1750 | |
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#843 | Journal Page: 2682 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2682 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2682 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2546 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Amended | 1-Price | Journal Page: 2544 |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 552 | |
House | 02/08/2023 | Filed |