Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1512
|
Journal Page: 3897
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3897
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Moody
|
Journal Page: 3895
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3895
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3823
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Leach
|
Journal Page: 3823
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)(1)
|
Journal Page: 3823
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3823
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|